Wesolowski, Eva (CPSO#: 66711)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Mar 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2006