Wesson, David Edwin (CPSO#: 32424)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2008