Wesson, Virginia Ann (CPSO#: 59314)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Level 1 Room L1 012
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6159
Fax: (416) 586-3231
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIRGINIA ANN WESSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 1989 to 15 Dec 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 11 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2006