West, Colin Stephen (CPSO#: 59953)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wee Care Pediatrics
7 Elliot Street
Hamilton HM 10
Bermuda
Phone: (441) 296-3032
Fax: (441) 296-3035

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Bermuda

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN STEPHEN WEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEST is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990