West, Kenneth Andrew (CPSO#: 55578)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1995