West, Lori Jeanne (CPSO#: 58770)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Tulane University School of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2006