Weste, Erica Sharone (CPSO#: 102397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Sep 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand Park Medical
Unit 208
719 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4L1
Phone: (905) 270-3636
Fax: (905) 270-8881
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Weste Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Weste ( CPSO# 102397)

Business Address:
Grand Park Medical
Suite 208
719 Central Parkway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 270-3636

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 May 2015 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2014 to 02 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 01 Mar 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Erica Sharone Weste may practise medicine independently in family medicine.