Westenberg, Hendrik Hans (CPSO#: 18954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Mar 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, German

Education:University of Amsterdam, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Lower Union Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2N3
Phone: 6135427095
Fax: 6135422224
Electoral District: 06

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Phone: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 13 Nov 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Mar 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Mar 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 9, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Hendrik Hans
            Westenberg, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Westenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  (a)   Dr. Westenberg shall restrict his practice of medicine solely to
                        his duties for: The Office of the Chief Coroner as an investigating
                        coroner; and/or Immigration Canada as a panel physician.