Westendorp, Matthew William (CPSO#: 76161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Family Physicians
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone: (519) 843-4380
Fax: (519) 843-3211
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Clinic, @ Walmart, Fergus, ON
801 St. David Street N.
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Canada
Phone: (519) 787-2940
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Canada
Phone: (519) 843-2010
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Westendorp Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Westendorp ( CPSO# 76161 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
Grand River Family Physicians
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 843-4380

Business Address:
801 St. David Street, North
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW WILLIAM WESTENDORP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTENDORP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003