Westmacott, Clare Wesley Maurice (CPSO#: 26695)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 1999