Westman, David Gilbert (CPSO#: 57120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Radia Inc PS
19020 33rd Ave W, Suite 210
Lynnwood, WA 98036
Lynwood WA  98036
United States
Phone: (425) 563-1500
Fax: (425) 563-1501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alaska
USA - California
USA - Idaho
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GILBERT WESTMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988