Weston, Roy Bertrand (CPSO#: 18368)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 20 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Dec 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 20 Oct 1995