Weston, William Fenton Douglas (CPSO#: 23462)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.F.D. Weston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Martins Peoples Storage, 42 Terry Fox Drive, Kingston, ON, K7M 8N5, (613)-545-1365
Date Received: 01 Jun 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1969
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016