Weston, William Michael (CPSO#: 57166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 224
1063 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4S3
Phone: (905) 516-4900
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM MICHAEL WESTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Jan 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989