Westreich, Neal Mark (CPSO#: 68932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-62
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4208
Fax: (416) 480-6818
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Westreich Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Westreich ( CPSO# 68932 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
FG-60 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4208

Business Address:
209 Charles Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 3A2
Phone Number: (905) 886-0470

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEAL MARK WESTREICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTREICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000