Wexler, Howard Ronald (CPSO#: 23949)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wexler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wexler ( CPSO# 24937 )
Dr. H. Wexler ( CPSO# 23949 )

Business Address:
272 Oxford Street West
London ON  N6H 1S9
Phone Number: (519) 434-2193

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre - St Josephs Hospital 268 Grosvenor Street London, ON N6A 4V2
Date Received: 27 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jan 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017