Whang, Paul (CPSO#: 54364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto
M3M0B2
Weston ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 2421000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

145 Queen street E
Brampton ON  L6W 3P8
Canada
Phone: 9054515855
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

1188 B Eglington Ave. West
Toronto ON  M6C 2E3
Canada
Phone: 4167857864
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

123 Edward Street, Suite 1401
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 4169249760
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4-3538 Keele St.
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

968 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON  M3K 1E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-7388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1315 Finch Ave. W
Toronto ON  M3J 2G5
Canada
Phone: (416) 634-0001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Whang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Whang ( CPSO# 54364 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (647) 962-0616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL WHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHANG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1987