Whatley, Darren Jay (CPSO#: 88406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
267 O'Connor Street, Suite 306
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 233-6652
Fax: (613) 233-0981
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darren Whatley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Whatley ( CPSO# 88406 )

Business Address:
Midtown Ottawa Family Health Organization
Suite 306
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone Number: (613) 233-6652

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN JAY WHATLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHATLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010