Whatley, Richard John (CPSO#: 32335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Peterborough Clinic
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6853
Fax: (705) 740-6863
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. J. Whatley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Whatley ( CPSO# 32335 )

Business Address:
The Peterborough Clinic
303 - 26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN WHATLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHATLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2017