Wheeler, Jesse Joseph Franklin (CPSO#: 92949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4554
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jesse J. Wheeler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wheeler ( CPSO# 92949 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSE JOSEPH FRANKLIN WHEELER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHEELER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012