Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Whelan, Chantal Irene (CPSO#: 55690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Carlington Community Health
Center
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone: (613) 722-9731 Ext. 264
Fax: (613) 722-8244
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 11 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHANTAL IRENE WHELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHELAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1986