Whelan, Mervyn Richard (CPSO#: 27579)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2016