Whelan, Thomas Francis (CPSO#: 61282)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996