Whelan, Timothy Joseph (CPSO#: 51289)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street, Rm. 4-204
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9711 Ext. 64501
Fax: (905) 575-6368
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Whelan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Whelan ( CPSO# 51289 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Room 4-204
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOSEPH WHELAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHELAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1988