Wherrett, Christopher George (CPSO#: 59690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Anesthesiology
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. G. Wherrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wherrett ( CPSO# 59690 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER GEORGE WHERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHERRETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989