Wherrett, Laurie Jane (CPSO#: 60680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 King Street West
Suite 2A
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J2
Phone: (905) 436-5870
Fax: (905) 436-2010
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laurie J. Wherrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wherrett ( CPSO# 60680 )

Business Address:
95 Bayly Street West
Room B03
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 426-2028

Business Address:
Suite 2A
194 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2J2
Phone Number: (905) 436-5870

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURIE JANE WHERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHERRETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1991