Wherry, Chad (CPSO#: 96703)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 24 Nov 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017