Wherry, Patrick Edward (CPSO#: 42653)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Urology Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2008