Whitby, Peter Lyndall (CPSO#: 31940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Apr 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 4111
250 Laurelwood Drive
Waterloo ON  N2H 0E2
Phone: (519) 904-0656
Fax: (519) 904-0658
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LYNDALL WHITBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jan 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985