White, Ann Kaye (CPSO#: 58884)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: White, Anne Kaye (used until: 03 May 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MED SCH AT HOUSTON, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994