White, Anne Margaret (CPSO#: 52395)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015