White, Bruce Kenneth (CPSO#: 57409)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2006