White, Cheryl Lea-Ann (CPSO#: 93407)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone: (519) 364-2820
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. White ( CPSO# 93407 )

Business Address:
90 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 1N1

Business Address:
Hanover Medical Associates
118 7th Avenue
Hanover ON  N4N 2G9
Phone Number: (519) 364-2820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA-ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 24 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Apr 2012 to 24 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Apr 2013 to 28 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014