White, Darrell John (CPSO#: 64124)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Sep 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 1995 to 30 Apr 1995
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1998