White, David Gordon (CPSO#: 29088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 501
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 223-0555
Fax: (416) 223-0540
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carroll White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. White ( CPSO# 29088 )
Dr. J. Carroll ( CPSO# 29087 )

Business Address:
Granovsky Gluskin Family Medicine Centre
Fourth Floor
60 Murray Street
Box 25
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Suite 501
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 223-0555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1977 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID GORDON WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1977