White, Frederick Albert (CPSO#: 61003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
481 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N7
Phone: (519) 578-9999
Fax: (519) 578-6109
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F.A. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. F. White ( CPSO# 61003 )

Business Address:
481 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N7
Phone Number: (519) 578-9999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 21 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FREDERICK ALBERT WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1990