Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

White, Gerald Andrew (CPSO#: 68221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4647
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 - 1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-2262
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

520 Locust St
Burlington ON
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 634-5573
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

408 North Service Rd Unit 1
Oakville ON  L6H 5R2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-4282
Fax: (905) 849-4630
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerry White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. White ( CPSO# 68221 )

Business Address:
100 - 1344 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7W5
Phone Number: (905) 842-2262

Business Address:
520 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 634-5573

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
Unit 1
408 North Service Road East
Oakville ON  L6H 5R2
Phone Number: (905) 849-4282

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD ANDREW WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999