White, Ian William Craig (CPSO#: 43371)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1981 to 31 Dec 1981
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007