White, Juliet (CPSO#: 26477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
116 Glen Manor Drive
Toronto ON  M4E 2X2
Phone: (416) 698-0999
Fax: (416) 698-0577
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Duke Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. White ( CPSO# 26477 )
Dr. A. Duke ( CPSO# 27955 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIET WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1974