White, Kevin Patrick (CPSO#: 61204)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 20 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of California, Davis, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1991
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 19 Mar 2004
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 20 Jan 2005

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jan 2005
Summary:

 On January 18, 2005, the Discipline Committee found Dr. White to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that he engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  In addition, the Committee found Dr. White to be  
 incompetent, relating to his prescribing practices with respect to one of his patients, and in 
 that he posted on the internet and used the hospital computer information services to distribute 
 pornographic materials relating to this patient.

On January 20, 2005, the Discipline Committee 
 ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar is directed to revoke Dr. White(s certificate of 
 registration, such revocation 	to take effect immediately.

2.	Dr. White is to attend before the 
 panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 	to be recorded on the register.

3.	Dr. 
 White pay costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 17, 2005