White, Lawrence Marshall (CPSO#: 60766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
1 - P M B 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Sinai Health System
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: L. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. White ( CPSO# 60766 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Munk Building, First Floor
1 PMB 284 - 585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800


Corporation Name: L.M. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. White ( CPSO# 60766 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. M. Beresford ( CPSO# 76273 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )

Business Address:
Suite 562
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE MARSHALL WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1991