White, Lisa Alexander (CPSO#: 63624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Health Services
100 Marie Curie Street Suite 300
PO Box 450, Station A
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr Beaupre Vein Clinic
Suite 600
1335 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8N8
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-0101
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ALEXANDER WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992