White, Melinda Ann (CPSO#: 95733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Andrew St Family Health Centre
16 Andrew St
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: 519-804-9234
Fax: 519-804-2604
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Canada
Phone: 905-873-3000
Fax: 905-873-0800
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. White ( CPSO# 95733 )

Business Address:
Andrew St Family Health Centre
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-9234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA ANN WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013