White, Michel (CPSO#: 58692)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993