Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

White, Nicholas Merson (CPSO#: 41874)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Aug 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2005