White, Sarah Marie (CPSO#: 103565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Superior Family Health
765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone: (705) 253-6599
Fax: (705) 253-9668
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. White ( CPSO# 103565)

Business Address:
300 - 765 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2A8
Phone Number: (705) 253-6599

Business Address:
1520 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2G4
Phone Number: (705) 949-2301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH MARIE WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2016