White, Stephen Francis (CPSO#: 66680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Napanee - L & A Hospital
8 Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone: (613) 354-3301
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. White ( CPSO# 66680 )

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington Hospital
8 Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN FRANCIS WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1995