Whitehead, Cynthia Ruth (CPSO#: 58392)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Family Practice Unit
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6060
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA RUTH WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1988