Whitehead, Jeffrey John (CPSO#: 33509)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 18 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathleen Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 27 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 5 Garand Place Ottawa, ON K1H 8M1
Date Received: 18 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 2016