Whitehead, Kristine Marguerite (CPSO#: 65337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Riverside Family Health Team
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8219
Fax: (613) 738-8217
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTINE MARGUERITE WHITEHEAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITEHEAD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993